U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harper
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report (Addendum)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report (Addendum)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Revised Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 10, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.