U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-20077-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Rule 16 Discovery]
  • April 30, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Re: Criminal Rule 5(f)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 25, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 25, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 11, 2025: [Indictment (Penalty Copy)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.