U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-20076-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Anderson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Rule 16 Discovery]
  • April 25, 2025: [Setting Letter]
  • April 25, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 25, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 22, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Re: Criminal Rule 5(f)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 14, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 11, 2025: [Indictment (Penalty Copy)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.