U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00689
  • Case Name: Taylor v. Byers et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Mediation]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Leave]
  • April 21, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 17, 2025: [Clarify]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.