U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00128
  • Case Name: Beitz v. Publix Super Markets, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 07, 2025: [Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements]
  • May 07, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac)]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Governing Motions To Dismiss]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Governing Depositions]
  • April 16, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 15, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.