U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00156
  • Case Name: Acuff v. RARE Hospitality International, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • May 06, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 29, 2025: [Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements]
  • April 28, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Consent/Nonconsent]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 16, 2025: [Certificate of Corporate Interest]
  • April 16, 2025: [Certificate of Citizenship]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Failure to File Certificate of Citizenship]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Failure to File CCI]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Governing Motions To Dismiss]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Governing Depositions]
  • April 16, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.