U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-20023-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Griggs
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Rule 16 Discovery]
  • April 23, 2025: [Setting Letter]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Protective Order ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 21, 2025: [Rule 16 Discovery]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Re: Criminal Rule 5(f)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.