U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Riverso
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 29, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 29, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 29, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 29, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 29, 2025: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 18, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.