U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-20051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Rule 16 Discovery]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 29, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Re: Criminal Rule 5(f)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • April 29, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 29, 2025: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 28, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 28, 2025: [Setting Letter]
  • April 28, 2025: [Report Date]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Exclude Time]
  • April 28, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Re: Criminal Rule 5(f)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Case Unsealed]
  • April 24, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Setting Letter]
  • April 16, 2025: [Rule 16 Discovery]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Case Unsealed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arraignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.