U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-20031-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Sammiguel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Rule 16 Discovery]
  • April 30, 2025: [Exhibit List ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 28, 2025: [Release Status Report]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 23, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Re: Criminal Rule 5(f)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.