U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00161
  • Case Name: Brockington v. Hume Health, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed (non-USA)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 23, 2025: [Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Governing Motions To Dismiss]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Governing Depositions]
  • April 18, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 18, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.