U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-mj-02156-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stoker et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 28, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • April 23, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.