U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-01684
  • Case Name: SCOTT ALAN WALKER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: HILDEBRAND, HENRY EDWARD [Exhibit to 341 Meeting of Creditors Record]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: HILDEBRAND, HENRY EDWARD [Notice of Appearance and Request for Service - BK Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: HILDEBRAND, HENRY EDWARD [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: HILDEBRAND, HENRY EDWARD [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: HILDEBRAND, HENRY EDWARD [Payroll Deduction - BK Order (SA)]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: HILDEBRAND, HENRY EDWARD [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: HILDEBRAND, HENRY EDWARD [Certificate of Compliance - 521(a)(1)]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: HILDEBRAND, HENRY EDWARD [Certificate of Credit Counseling Briefing (Debtor Only)]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: HILDEBRAND, HENRY EDWARD [Certificate of Service]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: HILDEBRAND, HENRY EDWARD [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: HILDEBRAND, HENRY EDWARD [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: HILDEBRAND, HENRY EDWARD [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: HILDEBRAND, HENRY EDWARD [Pay Filing Fees in Installments - BK Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.