U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00189
  • Case Name: Collier v. Mastoridis et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 25, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 21, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 21, 2025: [Supplement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.