U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00132
  • Case Name: Self v. Nationwide Recovery Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Create Case Association]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • April 29, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 29, 2025: [Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements]
  • April 28, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Governing Motions To Dismiss]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Governing Depositions]
  • April 24, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Certificate of Citizenship]
  • April 23, 2025: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Failure to File Certificate of Citizenship]
  • April 22, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.