U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00169
  • Case Name: Littlejohn v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Commencement of Social Security Action]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements]
  • April 28, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 23, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 22, 2025: [In Forma Pauperis (Proceed)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Complaint SSA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.