open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Texas
    Case Number:4:19-cr-00341-1
    Party Name:USA v. Gonzalez-Testino
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Order]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Return Passport]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Return Passport]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Emergency Motion (Sealed)]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Travel]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Mail Returned Undeliverable]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Document]
    Date Published:September 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Travel]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [PSI and Disclosure & Sentencing Dates (FORM)]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1668397
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =