open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas
    Case Number:4:20-cv-00109
    Party Name:Cunningham v. 360 Health Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Docket Correction]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Entry of Default by Clerk]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Availability]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.txed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?195533
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =