U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10458
  • Case Name: James J Hines
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Case Reassigned]
  • March 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Case Reassigned]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • February 27, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • February 25, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Modify Plan]
  • February 24, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
  • February 01, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Affidavit]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Transfer of Claim]
  • January 25, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Transfer of Claim]
  • January 14, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • January 14, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection]
  • December 04, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • December 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Motion Under Default Procedure]
  • December 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Ch 13 Tr Wages Pursuant to Wage Withholding Authorization]
  • December 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Wage Withholding/ACH/TFS Authorization]
  • December 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
  • December 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Modify Plan]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Notice of Delinquency]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing Not Held]
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Stipulation (Not to be used for Stipulated Motion)]
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
October, 2020
  • October 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • October 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Supplement]
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Response]
  • October 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order]
  • October 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Exhibit]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Supplement]
  • September 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • August 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order to Set Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • July 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order]
  • July 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Order]
  • July 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2020
  • June 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • June 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • June 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Withdrawal]
  • June 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Modify Plan]
  • June 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • June 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Motion Under Default Procedure]
  • June 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Shorten Time]
  • June 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • June 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
  • June 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Shorten Time]
  • June 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Modify Plan]
  • June 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Modify Plan]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order]
  • April 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Order]
  • April 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • March 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Document)]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Transfer of Claim]
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Transfer of Claim]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order to Set Hearing]
  • January 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Employ (Application)]
  • January 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Extend Time]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Compel]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Extend Time]
  • January 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Order]
  • January 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Employ (Application)]
December, 2019
  • December 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Extend Time]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Extend Time]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Notice of Delinquency]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Post-Petition Mortgage Fees, Expenses and Charges]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order Confirming Plan]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Closed]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Findings and Order Confirming 13 Plan]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
April, 2018
  • April 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Consent]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Paperless)]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Ntc Re Debtor Education Course Completion]
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice Regarding Debtor Education Course Completion (Ch 13)]
December, 2017
  • December 30, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Strip Wholly Unsecured Lien]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Continued]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Motion Under Default Procedure]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing Held]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Strip Wholly Unsecured Lien]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Preliminary Report]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Confirmation Hearing]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - 13 Plan]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Ch 13 Tr Wages Pursuant to Wage Withholding Authorization]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Wage Withholding/Automatic Debits from Bank Account Authorization]
  • November 06, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • November 06, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • November 06, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 06, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [All Schedules and Statements]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 24, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Deficiencies (13)]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [none]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.