U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10537
  • Case Name: Erica Dumont
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Trustee Fees]
  • June 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Final Decree]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order of Discharge]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [1-Discharging Debtor]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Form 423 - Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Extend Time]
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Extend Time]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Ntc Re Debtor Education Course Completion]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Hearing Not Held]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Notice Regarding Debtor Education Course Completion (Ch 7)]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Notice of Show Cause Hearing]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Hearing (Show Cause)]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Withdrawal]
  • March 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Consent]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Proposed Order]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Hearing (Document)]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Hearing Held]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Payment of Chapter 7 Installment Fee]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [none]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [341 Mtg Continued]
January, 2018
  • January 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order]
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Application (Generic)]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Application (Generic)]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Reconsider]
  • January 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Application to Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [All Schedules and Statements]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Deficiencies (7)]
  • December 23, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Application to Have the Filing Fee Waived]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.