U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10016
  • Case Name: Sheila Little
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Trustee Fees]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Final Decree]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order of Discharge]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [1-Discharging Debtor]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Reaffirmation Agreement Effective]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [341 Mtg Continued]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Form 423 - Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [none]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [none]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.