U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10033
  • Case Name: Albert A. Driver and Jean C. Driver
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Trustee Fees]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Final Decree]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order of Discharge]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [1-Discharging Debtor]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Form 423 - Financial Management Course Certificate]
February, 2018
  • February 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Avoid Lien]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Avoid Lien]
  • January 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Paperless)]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Creditor Request for Notices (Paperless)]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Creditor Request for Notices (Paperless)]
  • January 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [none]
  • January 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • January 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.