U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-01003
  • Case Name: Wells Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc. v. Vermont Agricultural Credit Corporation
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Proceeding]
June, 2018
  • June 17, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC - Order]
  • June 15, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order]
  • June 14, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Stipulation (Not to be used for Stipulated Motion)]
  • June 08, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Hearing (Document)]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order]
  • May 09, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • May 09, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Consent]
  • May 07, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • April 20, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC - Summons Issued]
  • April 18, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • April 18, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [none]
  • April 18, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.