U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10176
  • Case Name: Paul I. Kendall and Dorothy M. Kendall
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Trustee Fees]
  • September 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Final Decree]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order of Discharge]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [1-Discharging Debtor]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Reaffirmation Agreement Effective]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Form 423 - Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Withdrawal]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (Application)]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application)]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.