U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10330
  • Case Name: Sheryl A Sherman
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Modify Plan]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Modify Plan]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Case Reassigned]
  • March 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Case Reassigned]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • April 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • April 05, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Exhibit]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Order]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Exhibit]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Letter]
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Withdrawal]
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Letter]
January, 2021
  • January 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Consent]
  • January 26, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection]
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Notice of Delinquency]
August, 2019
  • August 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order Declaring Mediation Closed]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order Declaring Mediation Closed]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Document)]
  • December 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Modify Plan]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Ch 13 Tr Wages Pursuant to Wage Withholding Authorization]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Wage Withholding/Automatic Debits from Bank Account Authorization]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Modify Plan]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Form 423 - Financial Management Course Certificate]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Ntc Re Debtor Education Course Completion]
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order Confirming Plan]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice Regarding Debtor Education Course Completion (Ch 13)]
  • October 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Findings and Order Confirming 13 Plan]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Closed]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing Held]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Preliminary Report]
  • October 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Court Notice]
  • October 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice (Generic)]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Mortgage Mediation (Order)]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Continued]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Motion Under Default Procedure]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Mortgage Mediation]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Confirmation Hearing]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Show Cause Hearing]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - 13 Plan]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Ch 13 Tr Wages Pursuant to Wage Withholding Authorization]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing Not Held]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Wage Withholding/Automatic Debits from Bank Account Authorization]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Show Cause)]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [All Schedules and Statements]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Paperless)]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Deficiencies (13)]
  • August 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [none]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.