U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10399
  • Case Name: Linda Ellis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Final Decree]
  • January 04, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree]
December, 2020
  • December 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order Appr Fnl Rpt and Acct]
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Approving Final Report & Account]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
June, 2020
  • June 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • June 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • June 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Affidavit]
  • June 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Approval of Mortgage Modification (Order)]
May, 2020
  • May 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
  • May 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Approval of Mortgage Modification]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • April 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order to Set Hearing]
  • March 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order to Set Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
  • February 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Response]
November, 2019
  • November 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order]
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Notice of Delinquency]
  • July 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Consent]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Order]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Post-Petition Mortgage Fees, Expenses and Charges]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order Confirming Plan]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Findings and Order Confirming 13 Plan]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Relief from Stay (fee) (including Stipulated Motions for Relief from Stay)]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Withdrawal]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Supplement]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Transfer of Claim]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Transfer of Claim]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Post-Petition Mortgage Fees, Expenses and Charges]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Affidavit]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Supplement]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Post-Petition Mortgage Fees, Expenses and Charges]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Closed]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing Held]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Memorandum of Law]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
November, 2018
  • November 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Confirmation Hearing]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Continued]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Opposition]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Document)]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Paperless)]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • November 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Preliminary Report]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing To Stay On]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Determine Value of Collateral]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Confirmation Hearing]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - 13 Plan]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Ch 13 Tr Wages Pursuant to Wage Withholding Authorization]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Wage Withholding/Automatic Debits from Bank Account Authorization]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Deficiencies (13)]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [none]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [none]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.