U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10404
  • Case Name: Carolynne Fox
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Final Decree]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree]
  • January 16, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order Appr Fnl Rpt and Acct]
  • January 14, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Approving Final Report & Account]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
November, 2021
  • November 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • November 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order of Discharge]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [1-Discharging Debtor]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Findings Prior to Discharge in 12/13]
  • November 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Motion Under Default Procedure]
October, 2021
  • October 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Entry of Discharge]
  • October 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Form 423 - Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • October 05, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Completion of Plan Payments]
January, 2019
  • January 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order Confirming Plan]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Ntc Re Debtor Education Course Completion]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Findings and Order Confirming 13 Plan]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Withdrawal]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice Regarding Debtor Education Course Completion (Ch 13)]
  • December 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Findings and Order Confirming 13 Plan]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Closed]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing Held]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
November, 2018
  • November 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Confirmation Hearing]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Continued]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Preliminary Report]
October, 2018
  • October 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Determine Value of Collateral]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Determine Value of Collateral]
September, 2018
  • September 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
  • September 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • September 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Confirmation Hearing]
  • September 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - 13 Plan]
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Deficiencies (13)]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Ch 13 Tr Wages Pursuant to Wage Withholding Authorization]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Creditor Request for Notices (Paperless)]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Wage Withholding/Automatic Debits from Bank Account Authorization]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [none]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [none]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.