Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont
    Case Number:5:18-cr-00151-1
    Party Name:USA v. Cuthbertson
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:January 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:January 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:January 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
    Date Published:January 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:December 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:December 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
    Date Published:December 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:December 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:December 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:December 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention]
    Date Published:December 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment Unsealed]
    Date Published:December 26, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.vtd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?29796
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =