Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont
    Case Number:5:18-cr-00145-1
    Party Name:USA v. McCullough
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reentry Drug Court Proceedings]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Refer Defendant to Drug Court]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Refer to RFDC]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Certificate]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:January 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:January 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
    Date Published:January 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:January 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:January 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
    Date Published:January 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention]
    Date Published:January 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:January 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment Unsealed]
    Date Published:January 04, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vtd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?29787
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =