Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Vermont

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Vermont
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00006
    Party Name:Thompson v. Wright
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery Certificate - Initial Disclosures]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulated Discovery Schedule / Order]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order (Proposed)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Temporary Restraining Order]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vtd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?29831
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =