Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Vermont

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Vermont
    Case Number:19-10013
    Party Name:Robin Joy Peirce
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Form 423 - Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:February 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
    Date Published:February 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [none]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vtb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?40332
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =