Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Vermont

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Vermont
    Case Number:19-10012
    Party Name:William Edwards and Susan Edwards
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Consent]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Withdrawal]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Motion Under Default Procedure]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Closed]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Preliminary Report]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:January 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
    Date Published:January 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Ch 13 Tr Wages Pursuant to Wage Withholding Authorization]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Wage Withholding/Automatic Debits from Bank Account Authorization]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
    Date Published:January 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Deficiencies (13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [none]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vtb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?40331
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =