U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blanks
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Probation Form 12B]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 12, 2019: [Sentencing]
May, 2019
  • May 07, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 25, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 24, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 23, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 22, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 19, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 19, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 05, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • April 05, 2019: [Notice re: Information Establishing Prior Conviction (GOVT USE ONLY)]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • March 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • January 25, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 22, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 17, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.