U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cook
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Exhibit List]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 26, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 05, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 02, 2022: [Probation Form 12 (Sealed - No NEF)]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 04, 2022: [Release from Custody]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 26, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • April 13, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 29, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 02, 2022: [Transcript]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 24, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 23, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 16, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 05, 2021: [Probation Form 12]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 21, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 31, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • March 31, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 30, 2021: [Release from Custody]
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • March 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • March 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 25, 2021: [Document Unsealed]
  • March 24, 2021: [Probation Form 12 (Sealed - No NEF)]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 08, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 04, 2020: [Statement by Defendant re: Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 26, 2020: [Downward Departure]
  • May 20, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
  • April 14, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 09, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • April 08, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 08, 2020: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 20, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Transcript]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 22, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 22, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 22, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 19, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • July 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Withdrawal of Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 13, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 13, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 12, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 08, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • March 08, 2019: [Release from Custody]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 20, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • February 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 20, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 20, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • February 19, 2019: [Detention]
  • February 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 04, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Request for Writ]
  • January 17, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.