U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ranney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Probation Form 12B]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Transcript]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Removal - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • June 09, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • June 09, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 03, 2020: [Supplemental Document(s)]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • May 12, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 11, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • May 11, 2020: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - PDF is Sealed)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 08, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 08, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 04, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 04, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 04, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 04, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 13, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 10, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 09, 2020: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • January 09, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 08, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 08, 2020: [Document Unsealed]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion (Sealed - No NEF)]
  • January 08, 2020: [Ex Parte (Sealed - No NEF)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 08, 2020: [Sealed Motion (Sealed - No NEF)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • November 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 17, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • October 17, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 16, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 16, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • September 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 16, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 10, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 10, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 10, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 09, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 08, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • July 01, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • July 01, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • July 01, 2019: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • July 01, 2019: [Reconsideration ]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 22, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 19, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2019: [Indictment]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • January 22, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • January 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 17, 2019: [Indictment]
  • January 17, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.