U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Parris et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 30, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 13, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 17, 2022: [Probation Form 12]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 23, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • January 23, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • January 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 22, 2020: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • January 16, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 10, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • January 10, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 03, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 03, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • January 02, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • January 02, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 02, 2020: [Statement by Defendant re: Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 23, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • December 16, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 23, 2019: [Continue]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • September 30, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 23, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 23, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 23, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 20, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 06, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 06, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 06, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 06, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 05, 2019: [Continue]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Sever]
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Sever]
  • July 15, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sever]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Sever]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • May 14, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • May 13, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 26, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 25, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • April 25, 2019: [Reconsideration ]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 11, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • February 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • February 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 11, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 08, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 08, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 06, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 24, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 23, 2019: [Request for Writ]
  • January 23, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 18, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.