U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Escobar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Order Releasing Collateral]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 22, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 22, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • July 22, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 12, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 12, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • April 09, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 08, 2019: [Receipt for Passport]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 05, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 05, 2019: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 22, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 08, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • January 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.