U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thorn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • October 13, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • August 11, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 03, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 02, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 29, 2021: [Compassionate Release]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • September 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • September 24, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • September 24, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • September 13, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • August 12, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • May 21, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 17, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 17, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 17, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 17, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 09, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Application for Search Warrant]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 25, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • January 25, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 24, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.