U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hasankolli
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • April 13, 2020: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • April 03, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 03, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
  • April 03, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • April 03, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • April 03, 2020: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 29, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 19, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 13, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 13, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 13, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • September 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 13, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • September 05, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 08, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • July 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • March 13, 2019: [Proposed Order]
  • March 13, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • March 13, 2019: [Continue]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 27, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 21, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 21, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 19, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • February 15, 2019: [Release from Custody]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 30, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 30, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • January 28, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • January 25, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • January 25, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • January 25, 2019: [Detention]
  • January 25, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 25, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document (Sealed - No NEF)]
  • January 24, 2019: [Seal Document (Sealed - No NEF)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 24, 2019: [Indictment (Sealed - No NEF)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.