U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Milanese
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • November 02, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 02, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 02, 2020: [Statement by Defendant re: Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 28, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 25, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • June 22, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 18, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • November 12, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 08, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Reentry Drug Court Proceedings]
  • September 09, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Refer Defendant to Drug Court]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 09, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • September 09, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 09, 2019: [Refer to Drug Court]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 23, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 19, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 19, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • August 16, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 27, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 27, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • June 27, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 26, 2019: [Ex Parte (Sealed - No NEF)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 26, 2019: [Sealed Motion (Sealed - No NEF)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 10, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 10, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 30, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 30, 2019: [Document Unsealed]
  • May 24, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 24, 2019: [Continue]
  • May 02, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 01, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 29, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 29, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 29, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • January 28, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • January 28, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • January 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 28, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 28, 2019: [Detention]
  • January 28, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 28, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.