U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dulaurence
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • June 29, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 28, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 14, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 26, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • March 02, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 28, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 28, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 12, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • June 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 29, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • April 29, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 21, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • January 31, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 31, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 31, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 31, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • January 31, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 30, 2019: [Indictment]
  • January 30, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • January 29, 2019: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - PDF is Sealed)(COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.