U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Edwards
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 13, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 13, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 13, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 11, 2019: [Probation Form 12]
  • February 08, 2019: [Probation Form 12]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.