U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bedell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Order]
  • September 11, 2020: [Notice of Dismissal]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Post-Hearing Memorandum]
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order]
  • June 30, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 30, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • June 08, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order]
  • February 20, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • February 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 05, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • February 05, 2020: [Transcript]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 06, 2020: [Document Unsealed]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion (Sealed - No NEF)]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Transcript]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • October 30, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • October 25, 2019: [Reconsideration ]
  • October 18, 2019: [Competency Hearing]
  • October 08, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 07, 2019: [Psychiatric Report (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • October 04, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 05, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • June 03, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 03, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Suppress]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • March 26, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 26, 2019: [Detention]
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2019: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 26, 2019: [Indictment]
  • March 26, 2019: [Attorney Substitution]
  • March 26, 2019: [Complaint]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • March 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 20, 2019: [Extension of Time]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order]
  • February 27, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order]
  • February 22, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • February 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 22, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 22, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • February 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 22, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • February 20, 2019: [Detention]
  • February 13, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 11, 2019: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • February 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 01, 2019: [Request for Writ]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.