U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:11-cr-00166-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hagerstrom
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Probation Form 12B]
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Amended Judgment]
  • August 06, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 06, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 08, 2019: [Response to Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Produce ]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Produce]
  • February 06, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.