U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fitzgerald
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • July 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 27, 2022: [Attorney Substitution]
  • June 27, 2022: [Probation Form 12]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • September 16, 2020: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - PDF is Sealed)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 16, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • September 11, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • September 11, 2020: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • September 11, 2020: [Compassionate Release]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Final Order of Forfeiture]
  • December 05, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • December 03, 2019: [Transcript]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Final Order of Forfeiture]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Declaration of Publication (GOVT USE ONLY)]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • September 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 26, 2019: [Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • September 25, 2019: [Issuance of a Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • September 23, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • September 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 13, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • August 22, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 10, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 10, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 08, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 07, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 07, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • February 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • February 07, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 07, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 07, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 07, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • February 07, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 06, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.