U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00025-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Ambrosio Hernandez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Plea and Sentence]
  • June 28, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 26, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 25, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 18, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • June 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 14, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 14, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2019: [Waiver of Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 03, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 03, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • May 09, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Judgment (Petty Offense-MJ)]
  • April 15, 2019: [Plea and Sentence]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 11, 2019: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 08, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • April 08, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 12, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 08, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • February 08, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • February 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 08, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 07, 2019: [Indictment]
  • February 07, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.