U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Guerrero et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 13, 2020: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 11, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 05, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • July 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 14, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 13, 2020: [Compassionate Release]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 25, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 24, 2020: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • February 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 13, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 04, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • February 04, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 03, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 03, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 13, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 09, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • October 22, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 22, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 22, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 22, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • October 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 21, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 05, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 05, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 17, 2019: [Extension of Time]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • May 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Joinder ]
  • May 24, 2019: [Joinder]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 21, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Joinder ]
  • May 15, 2019: [Joinder]
  • May 13, 2019: [Discovery]
  • May 13, 2019: [Disclosure]
  • May 13, 2019: [Suppress]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 12, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • February 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 11, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 08, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.