U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Keeling et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Probation Form 12B]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • June 08, 2021: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • June 08, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 21, 2021: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • April 20, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 31, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • March 29, 2021: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • March 29, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 24, 2021: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • March 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 03, 2021: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • March 03, 2021: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • February 19, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 18, 2021: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • February 17, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • February 03, 2021: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • February 03, 2021: [Compassionate Release]
  • February 02, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Order Releasing Collateral]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 25, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 25, 2020: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • February 24, 2020: [Supplemental Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 19, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 19, 2020: [Not a motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 17, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 09, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • January 09, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 08, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 23, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 02, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 01, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • October 01, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 26, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 26, 2019: [Document Unsealed]
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Ex Parte Motion (Sealed - No NEF)]
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion (Sealed - No NEF)]
  • September 25, 2019: [Ex Parte (Sealed - No NEF)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 25, 2019: [Sealed Motion (Sealed - No NEF)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 09, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 06, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 06, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 04, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • September 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 28, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 28, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 02, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 02, 2019: [Continue]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 10, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • May 16, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 08, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 08, 2019: [Receipt for Passport]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • March 04, 2019: [Protective Order]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 21, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • February 21, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 21, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 21, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 19, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 19, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 19, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 15, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.