U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rivera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Probation Form 35]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • July 20, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
  • July 17, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 07, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 06, 2020: [Compassionate Release]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 10, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • October 08, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 05, 2019: [Release from Custody]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 03, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • July 03, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 03, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 02, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 19, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 19, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 19, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 19, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • February 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • February 19, 2019: [Detention]
  • February 15, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 15, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 15, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.