U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spilman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Return of Service Executed (non-summons)]
  • December 18, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 16, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 06, 2019: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • December 06, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • September 04, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • September 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 03, 2019: [Issuance of a Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 26, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 26, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 26, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 12, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • August 09, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • June 24, 2019: [Suppress]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • May 22, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 18, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 27, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 27, 2019: [Document Unsealed]
  • March 18, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 06, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 06, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 21, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 21, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • February 21, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 21, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • February 21, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 19, 2019: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • February 15, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 15, 2019: [Indictment]
  • February 14, 2019: [Revocation of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.